LEST WE FORGET ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide benefits to disadvantaged men and women in or out of hospitals and homes whether due to disability or circumstances, who have or who are serving in the Armed Forces or the Merchant Navy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 11 June 2015: CIO registration
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-9 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION'-THE MOLESEYS AND HAM...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-8 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION-BRIGHTON AND HOVE BRA...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-7 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION-BOROUGH OF TWICKENHAM...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-6 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION-KINGSTON UPON THAMES ...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-5 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATON-MALDEN AND COOMBE BRAN...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-4 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION-WIMBLEDON AND MERTON ...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-3 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION-COBHAM AND DISTRICT B...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-2 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION-EPSOM, EWELL, AND DIS...
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390-1 LEST WE FORGET ASSOCIATION-KODAK (HARROW) BRANCH
- 06 July 2015: Funds received from 200390 'LEST WE FORGET' ASSOCIATION
- LEST WE FORGET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Pascoe | Chair | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Harris | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richards | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Bruce | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Justin Boynton | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicolas Karonias | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
BYRON MICHAEL TURNER | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £823.08k | £867.17k | £246.27k | £153.03k | £371.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £207.46k | £173.49k | £205.86k | £203.94k | £249.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £620.80k | £721.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £188.06k | £138.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £14.22k | £7.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £602.00k | £720.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £163.97k | £129.61k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £43.49k | £43.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.86k | £3.92k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £155.86k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £43.49k | £43.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED MEN AND WOMEN IN OR OUT OF HOSPITALS AND HOMES, WHO HAVE OR WHO ARE SERVING IN THE ARMED FORCES OR THE MERCHANT NAVY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Treetops
Mylor Downs
FALMOUTH
Cornwall
TR11 5UL
- Phone:
- 07735532006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window