VOLUNTEERING MOLDOVA CIO
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteering Moldova is a non-profit charity that aims to benefit the lives of vulnerable people living in state run institutions in Moldova. We are able to do this in two ways: volunteering and financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Moldova
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £5.39k | £2.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.90k | £6.56k | £3.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 03 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 03 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 September 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 19 September 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 05 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 05 August 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 May 2015
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN MOLDOVA BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window