THE INDEPENDENT BALDOCK BEER FESTIVAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants & donations for charitable purposes for the public benefit in Baldock (Herts) and the surrounding area as are exclusively charitable according to the laws of England and wales as the trustees may from time to time determine. Principle fund raising activity is the annual Independent Baldock Beer Festival and other similar but ad hoc events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 September 2015: CIO registration
- Baldock Community Charitable Fund (Working name)
- BBF (Working name)
- THE INDEPENDENT BALDOCK BEER FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TARA JANE GEERE | Chair | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Stephen Alexander Willoughby | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Kieran Oliver Willoughby | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Don Mckenzie | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Jane Copsey | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robinson William Brough | Trustee | 18 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW JAMES GEERE | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL EDWARDS | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr DUNCAN JAMES STACEY DR | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
STUART JOHN JOHNSTON | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN LOUISE STACEY | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRENT MARTIN COPSEY | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.74k | £2.94k | £11.62k | £100.85k | £17.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.19k | £8.33k | £4.31k | £87.40k | £19.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 December 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 December 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 December 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 03 December 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BALDOCK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Church Street
BALDOCK
Hertfordshire
SG7 5AE
- Phone:
- 01462625962
- Email:
- baldockbeer@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window