CHILDREN AND YOUTH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) to promote sustainable development for the benefit of the public by the promotion of the concerns of future generations, (c) to support young people and children and youth organisations in the UN Major Group for Children and Youth through fundraising, legal support, knowledge sharing and accreditation to United Nations processes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Eswatini
- Kenya
- United States
Governance
- 16 September 2015: Standard registration
- CYI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Kate Costello | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bubacarr Singhateh | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anja Olin Pape | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rohit Keshav Pothukuchi | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruxanda Renita | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roman Chukov | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Khaled Mohamed Mahmoud Abdelrahim Emam | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donovan Guttieres | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jolly Amatya | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moa Maria Herrgard | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aaasish Khullar | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £9.24k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £6.56k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 November 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEP 2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/2014 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2014 AS AMENDED ON 19/07/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 18-35 IN PARTICIPATING IN THE UN MAJOR GROUP OF CHILDREN AND YOUTH IN SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT NEGOTIATIONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS AND COURSES TO INDIVIDUALS AND YOUTH GROUPS. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Children and Youth International
c/o Office of Lloyd Russell-Moyle
11 Hunns Mere Way
BRIGHTON
BN2 6AH
- Phone:
- 01273252929
- Email:
- info@childrenyouth.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window