Trustees CHILDREN AND YOUTH INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1163598

Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Kate Costello | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bubacarr Singhateh | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anja Olin Pape | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rohit Keshav Pothukuchi | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruxanda Renita | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roman Chukov | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Khaled Mohamed Mahmoud Abdelrahim Emam | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Donovan Guttieres | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jolly Amatya | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moa Maria Herrgard | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aaasish Khullar | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.