THE SOCIETY OF STRANGE AND ANCIENT INSTRUMENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society of Strange and Ancient Instruments provides musical performances, lecture-recitals and workshops, information, a forum and other facilities in respect of unusual historical instruments, for as wide an audience as possible throughout the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 October 2015: CIO registration
- SSAI (Working name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Kelly | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Fell | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emilia Anne Benjamin | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aidan Samuel Hendrickse | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Paul Hendrickse | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antony Justin Althaus | Trustee | 15 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £19.38k | £12.61k | £193 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.57k | £10.82k | £19.34k | £72 | £2.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 23 April 2025 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 263 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 263 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING MUSICAL PERFORMANCES, LECTURE RECITALS AND WORKSHOPS, INFORMATION, A FORUM AND OTHER FACILITIES IN RESPECT OF UNUSUAL HISTORICAL INSTRUMENTS, TO AS WIDE AN AUDIENCE AS POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Wellmeadow Road
LONDON
SE13 6TB
- Phone:
- 07767407043
- Email:
- denisemellion@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window