Financial history WINFRITH NEWBURGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1162058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £15.13k £13.02k £6.87k £10.20k £14.60k
Total expenditure £10.58k £4.70k £8.42k £16.80k £14.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A N/A