Accounts and annual returns JOY MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1161539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 February 2024 08 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 February 2024 08 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 February 2023 13 April 2024 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 February 2023 13 April 2024 122 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 February 2022 09 February 2023 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 February 2022 09 February 2023 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 February 2021 29 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 February 2020 22 March 2021 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 February 2020 22 March 2021 99 days late Download Open in new window