Financial history ASAWORTA COMMUNITY SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1166284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.99k £25.09k £3.16k £4.18k £2.18k
Total expenditure £2.20k £3.27k £5.68k £7.93k £2.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A