Parkinson's Europe

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Membership Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£578,064
Donations and legacies | £24.13k | |
Charitable activities | £553.45k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £478 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£570,864
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £570.86k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £570.86k | |
Retained for future use | £7.20k |
People

6 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Belgium
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Ukraine
Governance
- 19 August 2015: CIO registration
- EPDA (Working name)
- Parkinson's Europe (Working name)
- EUROPEAN PARKINSON'S DISEASE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josefa Maria Malta Domingos | Chair | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janette Sinclair | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Ildal | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Molohan | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Bale | Trustee | 26 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian John Magennis | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Samuel Butler | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonella Moretti | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Boyle | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £366.20k | £559.97k | £605.98k | £324.36k | £578.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £342.70k | £519.67k | £564.49k | £575.00k | £570.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £28.28k | £31.23k | N/A | £24.13k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £531.68k | £407.85k | N/A | £553.45k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £478 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £166.90k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £519.67k | £564.49k | N/A | £570.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £6.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £6.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £590.72k | £597.42k | N/A | £278.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £255.48k | £250.18k | N/A | £184.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Aug 2015 as amended on 02 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM PARKINSON’S DISEASE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 1) TO CHALLENGE EXISTING MIND-SETS, SHIFT ATTITUDES AND REMOVE THE HURDLES THAT PREVENT PEOPLE WITH PARKINSON’S FROM RECEIVING EARLY AND APPROPRIATE TREATMENT AND INDIVIDUALISED CARE; 2) TO INCREASE PUBLIC AND POLITICAL AWARENESS OF PARKINSON’S; AND 3) TO HELP REDUCE STIGMA AND REMOVE DISCRIMINATION AGAINST PEOPLE WITH PARKINSON’S.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baxter & Co
Lynwood House
2-4 Crofton Road
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR6 8QE
- Phone:
- + 44 7928 051719
- Email:
- info@parkinsonseurope.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window