Accounts and annual returns FAMILIES AND CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION

Charity number: 1165830
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2020 29 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 29 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 01 January 2019 15 November 2019 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 15 November 2019 14 days late
Annual return 01 January 2018 21 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 21 October 2018 On Time
Annual return 01 January 2017 30 October 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required