WINGHAM WILDLIFE PARK ANIMAL WELFARE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WWPAW is an independent, non-political, not for profit enterprise whose aim is to raise funds to support animal welfare & conservation, specifically to: Relieve the suffering of animals. Conserve earth's natural resources with projects & initiatives dealing with preserving & protecting living animals & their habitats. Educate the public through programmes raising awareness & respect for nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,500 from 8500 government contract(s) and £8,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Kent
- Uganda
- Vietnam
Governance
- 23 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laurice Meredith | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Wilder | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Sutclffe | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT BINSKIN | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.28k | £10.83k | £10.60k | £9.47k | £32.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.09k | £20.38k | £5.72k | £9.91k | £31.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY?S OBJECTS (?OBJECTS?) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: ?FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: (1) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION; (2) TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS; (3) TO CONSERVE THE EARTH?S NATURAL RESOURCES, THROUGH PROJECTS AND INITIATIVES DEALING WITH THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF LIVING ANIMALS AND THEIR HABITATS; (4) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN A FORMAL AND INFORMAL MANNER, THROUGH EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES RAISING AWARENESS AND RESPECT OF ANIMALS AND NATURE?.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wingham Wildlife Park
Rusham Road
Shatterling
Canterbury
CT3 1JL
- Phone:
- 01227720975
- Website:
-
WWPAW.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window