Financial history NAITBABIES

Charity number: 1161698
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £12.44k £4.32k £8.65k £5.81k £4.03k
Total expenditure £16.37k £1.89k £1.99k £2.44k £4.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A