ALPKIT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Alpkit Foundation is here to help people overcome the obstacles that prevent them from Going Nice Places and Doing Good Things. We help people experience the outdoors that wouldn?t be possible without our help.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 July 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HANNEY | Chair | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Cornforth | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi King | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ross Steedman | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Victoria Littlejohn | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eloise Marie Cundill | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pete Whittaker | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adge Last | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|||||
COLIN ALEXANDER STOCKER | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH PHILIP STOCKER | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS IOAN SMITH | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.83k | £78.36k | £167.26k | £164.98k | £204.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.90k | £64.06k | £168.87k | £127.73k | £222.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
(1)TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (3)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONVERSATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT. (4)FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (5)TO ADVANCE SPORT OR GAMES WHICH PROMOTE HEALTH BY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL SKILL OR EXERTION AND WHICH ARE UNDERTAKEN ON AN AMATEUR BASIS. (6) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALPKIT LTD
UNIT 12-14 OAK HOUSE
MOORGREEN INDUSTRIAL PARK
ENGINE LANE
NEWTHORPE
NG16 3QU
- Phone:
- 01773417007
- Email:
- akf@alpkit.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window