FRIENDS OF LUMOS USA LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Lumos USA Ltd supports work to transform the lives of disadvantaged children by facilitating the end of institutional care, in two ways: 1) at a policy level: to accelerate and improve the quality of reform in health, education and social protection services 2) at a practical level: working with providers of children's services to demonstrate the value of family-based care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bulgaria
- Czech Republic
- Greece
- Haiti
- Moldova
Governance
- 03 November 2016: Standard registration
- 01 November 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- FRIENDS OF LUMOS USA; FOLUSA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £175 | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.22k | £2.96k | £3.14k | £3.04k | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window