Financial history IMPACT BARNET

Charity number: 1161670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £74.63k £8.85k £53.93k £29.72k £59.40k
Total expenditure £31.25k £28.31k £37.48k £41.65k £45.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A