Financial history 1ST UPTON ON SEVERN SCOUTS

Charity number: 506098
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £17.77k £21.55k £10.51k £12.55k £9.15k
Total expenditure £33.47k £15.19k £17.56k £17.84k £10.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A