Accounts and annual returns SHOUT AT CANCER

Charity number: 1163063
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 04 March 2025 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2023 20 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 20 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 22 February 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 22 February 2023 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 03 February 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 03 February 2022 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 11 March 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 11 March 2021 38 days late Download Open in new window