PLOT 22

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We host communal gardening and outdoor cooking opportunities, seasonal celebration events for our community of garden volunteers, outdoor skills sharing workshops. We offer our garden space as a unique outdoor venue for therapeutic activities. We share learning through hosting skills sharing opportunities, visual tools, books and learning resources, and an online collaboration platform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £11,873 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 17 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bunty Dann | Chair | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Mayor | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Evans | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Ridden | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rowledge | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNIE SMITH | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.52k | £72.37k | £111.89k | £98.83k | £83.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.67k | £68.47k | £99.51k | £82.73k | £86.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.42k | £40.42k | £12.04k | £12.50k | £11.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION BY PROVIDING AN AREA FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY GARDEN AND ALLOTMENT AND OTHER ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS IN BRIGHTON & HOVE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECTS OF HORTICULTURE, HEALTHY EATING, CONSERVATION OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND IMPROVEMENT OF WILDLIFE DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR LEARNING IN AND AROUND THE COMMUNITY GARDEN/ALLOTMENT. 3. TO ADVANCE HEALTH BY THE PROMOTION OF I) PHYSICAL EXERCISE THROUGH GARDENING II) THERAPEUTIC HORTICULTURE III) HEALTHY EATING, FOR INDIVIDUALS IN BRIGHTON, HOVE AND SURROUNDING AREAS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Welkin
Hill Top Road
West Hoathly
EAST GRINSTEAD
West Sussex
RH19 4QJ
- Phone:
- 07801230935
- Email:
- info@plot22.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window