PIMLICO MUSICAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1163223
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Foundation provides music tuition and performance opportunities to children and young people living in Pimlico. The Foundation benefits the wider community by organising high quality choral performances in local venues, thus improving access to culture in the area. It promotes social cohesion by encouraging contact between people of different ages, faiths, ethnicities and backgrounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £156,259
Total expenditure: £180,300

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 August 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Liane Tylee Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Charlotte Baly Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Laura Ayn Holleman Trustee 29 June 2021
None on record
Kevin James Stoneham Trustee 14 April 2021
None on record
Felix Matthew William Martin Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
TAMARA HELEN PASTERNAK OPPENHEIMER Trustee 05 December 2019
THE NUREMBERG TRUST
Received: On time
Dr RALPH ALLWOOD MBE, DMus Trustee 19 November 2015
The Choral Evensong Trust
Received: On time
Dr Stephen Richard Sklaroff Trustee 20 August 2015
KNAPP FOUNDATION CIO
Received: On time
GINGKO
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GABRIEL'S, WARWICK SQUARE, PIMLICO
Received: On time
Owen Christopher Goodwin Higgs Trustee 20 August 2015
SOCIETY FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE FAITH
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GABRIEL'S, WARWICK SQUARE, PIMLICO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £156.59k £101.29k £100.69k £134.17k £156.26k
Total expenditure £109.84k £82.46k £127.29k £144.75k £180.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. GABRIELS PARISH HOUSE
CHURCHILL GARDENS
LONDON
SW1V 3AA
Phone:
02078347520
Website:

pimlicomusicalfoundation.org.uk