THE HEALTHY LIFE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The mission of the foundation is to support scientific and medical research targeted at preventing degenerative diseases such as cancer, dementia and heart disease and extending both human health span and life span, thus improving quality of life nationally and globally.Fundraising for and awarding grants to cutting-edge research into ageing, translational research with clear patient benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Swift | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR MAURICE WATKINS | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANN DOWIE | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67 | £36 | £1.81k | £102 | £313 | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.63k | £7.80k | £3.18k | £3.97k | £772 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) BY SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO EXTENDING THE HUMAN LIFE SPAN AND THE PREVENTION OF DEGENERATIVE DISEASES (AND FACILITATING THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Royal Court
8 Kings Gardens
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 2PF
- Phone:
- 01273227672
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window