CHORLEY WANDERERS JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1166354
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Chorley Wanderers Junior Football Club (CWJFC) currently (as at January 2019) supports several boys' football teams ranging from under-7s to under 16s. All teams are managed by qualified coaches and assistants who run the club together with a committee of volunteers in various roles. There are also social activities involving parents and families.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £54,180
Total expenditure: £43,426

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 April 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CWJFC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Daniel McDermott Chair 01 September 2018
None on record
STEVEN FLUX Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
COLETTE WHITING Trustee 22 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £31.18k £35.66k £46.49k £53.87k £54.18k
Total expenditure £28.70k £40.59k £45.58k £53.48k £43.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £1.25k N/A £500 £1.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 22 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 22 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 23 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 12 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 22 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 The Willows
CHORLEY
Lancashire
PR7 3RQ
Phone:
07815 887 818
Website:

No information available