Financial history SHA'AREI SHALOM, THE NORTH MANCHESTER REFORM CONGREGATION

Charity number: 506117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £103.97k £108.51k £132.14k £144.44k £128.78k
Total expenditure £79.12k £91.93k £113.70k £113.82k £130.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A