LARCHFIELD TANZANIA HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 2011 Larchfield (as Larchfield Charity Organisation) (?Larchfield Tanzania?) was legally set up as an NGO [#00NG0/00005420] and acquired acquired 7.5 acres of land at Mkuranga, (some 40 miles south of Dar-es-Salaam) where there are many disadvantaged children - the lucky ones are fostered with other families. With government and private sector encouragement the Larchfield Project began.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Tanzania
Governance
- 20 August 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JULIAN ALEXANDRA SKIDMORE | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES MICHAEL KENNY | Trustee | 27 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.64k | £31.59k | £20.88k | £14.15k | £78.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.18k | £21.71k | £29.73k | £1.19k | £27.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06/08/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ORPHANS IN THE DISTRICT OF MKURANGA, TANZANIA BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING AN ORPHANAGE TO PROVIDE FOR THEIR NEEDS IN RELATION TO FOOD, SHELTER, CLOTHING AND EDUCATION. 2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE DISTRICT OF MKURANGA, TANZANIA AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
222 Meadvale Road
LONDON
W5 1LT
- Phone:
- 02089970388
- Email:
- contactus@larchfieldkids.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window