EASTHORPE COMMON LANDS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run allotments for local people. We also rent out fields and invest. Our income is donated in the form of small grants to those in need who meet the Trust's objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 March 1977: Standard registration
- EASTHORPE CHARITY (Working name)
- EASTHORPE TRUST (Working name)
- ECLF (Working name)
- THE EASTHORPE CHARITY (Working name)
- COMMON LANDS EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS KNAPTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Francis Stott | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Joseph Henson Radford | Trustee | 12 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Vaughan Blaney | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY MITCHELL | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.25k | £7.89k | £17.27k | £13.05k | £23.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.89k | £26.01k | £9.65k | £7.10k | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF EASTHORPE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS, OR IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT:- (A) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR; (B) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.*
Area of benefit
EASTHORPE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willows
Burgage Lane
SOUTHWELL
Nottinghamshire
NG25 0ER
- Phone:
- 01636816998
- Email:
- easthorpetrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window