Financial history FULL CIRCLE FUND THERAPIES

Charity number: 1162010
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £66.61k £99.16k £78.95k £50.47k £63.25k
Total expenditure £66.06k £78.53k £94.31k £62.05k £50.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A