BERKSHIRE COUNTY GIRLS FOOTBALL LEAGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Berkshire County Girls Football League, provides developmental and competitive football for girls from ages 7 to 18. It also supports player, coach & referee development through the provision of courses/events or through its managers' meetings. It has a website (www.bcgfl.org.uk) to promote both the activities of the league and all aspects of female football in Berkshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bracknell Forest
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 15 June 2015: CIO registration
- BERKSHIRE GIRLS FOOTBALL CHARITY (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CORAL JOHN BSC | Chair | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Anne Loughrey | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Swallow | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ethan Greene | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Ann Wellington | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN STRANGE FCMA BSC | Trustee | 22 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.51k | £3.91k | £24.48k | £19.54k | £26.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.37k | £3.17k | £16.24k | £16.92k | £20.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 29 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 15 JUN 2015 AMENDED ON 12 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF WOMEN AND GIRLS IN THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE:- • LEAGUES, CUP COMPETITIONS AND OTHER FIXTURES; • ACTIVITIES TO RAISE STANDARDS OF PLAYING, COACHING AND REFEREEING IN FEMALE FOOTBALL; AND • ACTIVITIES TO INCREASE PARTICIPATION AND FACILITATE ACCESS TO THE SPORT TO ALL FEMALES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 Pennfields
Ruscombe
READING
RG10 9BG
- Phone:
- 07787533558
- Email:
- secretary@bcgfl.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window