NORTHUMBERLAND HOSPITAL RADIO (INCORPORATING RADIO WANSBECK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NHR is the hospital broadcasting service for Northumberland and North Tyneside. The Charity also provides a public address, music and commentary service for outside events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 08 March 1977: Standard registration
- NHR (Working name)
- NORTHUMBERLAND HOSPITAL RADIO (Working name)
- NORTHUMBERLAND HOSPITAL RADIO (Previous name)
- RADIO WANSBECK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING (Previous name)
- RADIO WANSBECK HOSPITAL BROADCASTING GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS FRYATT | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEREK SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN DAVID MILES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.17k | £3.01k | £3.90k | £4.11k | £4.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £1.26k | £6.87k | £4.61k | £4.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED 20 MARCH 1977, 4 FEBRUARY 1990, 13 DECEMBER 1992, 27 FEBRUARY 1996 AND 29 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A RADIO BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHUMBERLAND HOSPITAL RADIO
WANSBECK GENERAL HOSPITAL
WOODHORN LANE
ASHINGTON
NE63 9JJ
- Phone:
- 08448118111
- Email:
- studio@nhr.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window