APOSTOLIC FAITH MISSION (UK) INTERNATIONAL WALSALL ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AS CONTAINED IN THE CONFESSION OF FAITH. COMMUNITY BUILDING THROUGH WEEKLY WORSHIP AND PRAYER SERVICES PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY COHESION AND PEACE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES. UPLIFTMENT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGH CHARITABLE WORK AS PRESCRIBED BY THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 June 2015: CIO registration
- AFM WALSALL ASSEMBLY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIP MHLANGA | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fero Dube | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jaqueline Sechele | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Blessing Magara | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.51k | £38.65k | £6.64k | £6.23k | £16.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.71k | £27.60k | £18.04k | £9.81k | £16.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 16 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES AS CONTAINED IN THE CONFESSION OF FAITH. COMMUNITY BUILDING THROUGH WEEKLY WORSHIP AND PRAYER SERVICES PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY COHESION AND PEACE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES. UPLIFTMENT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGH CHARITABLE WORK AS PRESCRIBED BY THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY SCRIPTURES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
161 WEST BROMWICH ROAD
WALSALL
WS1 3HP
- Phone:
- 07795383790
- Email:
- Phillipmhlanga20@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window