LAKESIDE C.A.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing facilities for community activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 March 1977: Standard registration
- LAKESIDE C.A (Working name)
- GILLEY LAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LAKESIDE & GILLEY LAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LAKESIDE AND GILLEY LAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Porthouse | Chair | 05 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Richmond Elikplim Dzramado | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frances Onehideba Iyamu | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Darren Spoors | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol-Ann Kearns | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Mulvaney Ms | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darryl Oliver Dixon | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ambrose | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.94k | £11.97k | £9.11k | £12.65k | £12.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.95k | £13.96k | £7.81k | £9.82k | £12.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 OCTOBER 1976 AS AMENDED 10 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF GILLEY LAW AND DISTRICT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
GILLEY LAW AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Careen Crescent
Middle Herrington
Sunderland
SR3 3TF
- Phone:
- 07765864397
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window