BEACON ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To rescue and re-home animals (with a particular focus on dogs and cats) from both the UK and other countries. The animals are transported, given a health assessment, receive medical treatment where necessary and neutered and given a pet passport. They are then placed in rented kennels or in foster care until an appropriate permanent home is found for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
- Thailand
Governance
- 28 April 2015: CIO registration
- BARC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA LEATHER | Chair | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
THERESA LEATHER | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
LENA CHANCA | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE PEREIRA | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.59k | £32.77k | £12.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.64k | £32.59k | £13.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1125 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON DOGS AND CATS, WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rosebrae
Iffin Lane
Canterbury
CT4 7BD
- Phone:
- 07547 909993
- Email:
- info@barc.uk.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window