Financial history CECIL'S HORSE SANCTUARY

Charity number: 1167523
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £54.98k £47.25k £39.79k £64.12k £82.14k
Total expenditure £44.97k £41.78k £37.53k £56.79k £77.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A N/A N/A