Financial history ROOTS4LIFE

Charity number: 1165003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £51.00k £87.75k £117.52k £156.88k
Total expenditure £0 £12.92k £86.54k £142.26k £135.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A