ROOTS4LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Roots4life is a community action project set up to tackle childhood obesity. To achieve this we intend to teach cooking skills, horticulture and the importance of nutrition. We also include exercise and mindfulness to support mental well being. It is hoped to include families, schools and community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bexley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 30 December 2015: CIO registration
- R4L (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven James McAllister Fisher | Chair | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Utomoibor | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Amos | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Liz Gale | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £51.00k | £87.75k | £117.52k | £156.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £12.92k | £86.54k | £142.26k | £135.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 232 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 September 2024 | 232 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 August 2023 | 212 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 30 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING THROUGH VOCATIONAL TRAINING, IN THE AREAS OF: LAND CULTIVATION AND FOOD PRODUCTION, COOKERY, PREPARATION AND PROCESSING OF FOOD, CATERING, FOOD SERVICE AND DISTRIBUTION, HEALTHY EATING, AND OTHER DIRECTLY ASSOCIATED AREAS.’ THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A GARDEN FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF GREENWICH, LEWISHAM, SOUTHWARK AND BEXLEY AND VISITORS TO THE AREA (THE BENEFICIARIES) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR, AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF, THE SAID BENEFICIARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
245
Footscray Road
LONDON
New Eltham
SE9 2EL
- Phone:
- 07470 802379
- Email:
- hello@roots4life.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window