Financial history SOUTHPORT U3A

Charity number: 1164448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £142.86k £65.47k £21.41k £171.85k £192.23k
Total expenditure £134.10k £69.39k £17.46k £166.65k £182.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A