Trustees THETFORD U3A
Charity number: 1161699

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leslie Braund | Chair | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Robertson | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joy Flaherty | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Margaret Boldock | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Batstone | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Hodgkinson | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Thompson | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Fabian | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia O'Brien | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denise Skinner | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Harris | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Fabian | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Walter Boldock | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.