SHINE OUT OF SCHOOL CLUBS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing wrap around care via Out of School Clubs in Evesham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 December 2023
Total income includes £41,791 from 7 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 July 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glen Lyon | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Lindley Roberts | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariia Shumylo | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annette Stephanie France | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Chris Sheehan | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/12/2019 | 17/12/2020 | 17/12/2021 | 17/12/2022 | 17/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.50k | £64.45k | £43.21k | £46.90k | £72.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.55k | £60.49k | £54.93k | £50.38k | £63.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.36k | £32.09k | £41.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 100 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 17 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS IN EVESHAM, WORCS. 2. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. THE ABOVE OBJECTS ARE CARRIED OUT IN ACCORDANCE WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS & ST.
LAWERENCE
MARKET PLACE
EVESHAM
WR11 4RW
- Phone:
- 07977 072105
- Email:
- chris@archbenefice.org.uk
- Website:
-
Http://ShineOutOfSchoolClubs.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window