Accounts and annual returns THE NEWCASTLE DREAM CHURCH

Charity number: 1163020
Charity reporting is up to date (159 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 April 2025 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 January 2025 433 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late Download Open in new window