BRUNDIBAR ARTS FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Music and Arts Festival based in Newcastle and Gateshead.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 07 December 2015: Standard registration
- BRUNDIBAR ARTS FESTIVAL LTD (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALEXANDRA RAIKHLINA | Chair | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Svetlana Cherlin | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
YOSHIE KAWAMURA | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIET LEE | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.59k | £13.91k | £39.39k | £36.96k | £49.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.15k | £4.40k | £40.85k | £38.74k | £55.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.00k | £2.50k | £750 | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 May 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUN 2015
Charitable objects
EDUCATION MUSIC AND ARTS RACIAL HARMONY
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Whitfield Drive
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE12 8LD
- Phone:
- 07809 764326
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window