KP24 FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to support children to have better chances in life through uniquely designed sport and education projects. We work with a range of young people from less fortunate communities providing them with access to highly valuable programs enabling them to improve their personal skills. We also work with OcuMel UK to support families and patients affected by Ocular Melanoma.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- India
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 01 June 2015: CIO registration
- KP24, THE KEVIN PIETERSEN FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AIMEE LOGAN | Chair | 01 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN PIETERSEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD BROWNING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 303 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1034 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1399 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1399 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1764 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. (2) TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO CHARITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CONCERNED WITH THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION PROVIDED THAT ANY SUCH SUPPORT SHALL BE CONDITIONED UPON IT BEING APPLIED SOLELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Brent Villa
Winchester Road
Bishops Waltham
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1BD
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- info@kp24foundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window