FOUNTAIN OF LIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fountain of Life exists to bring sustainable safe drinking water, improved hygiene, and sanitation to those who have access to only unimproved facilities through appropriate technologies and education. Focusing mainly but not exclusively on Sub-Saharan West Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Senegal
Governance
- 23 July 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phil Tunstall | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ann Lambert | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK PROVIS | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER WHITBY | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £7.20k | £11.42k | £19.90k | £24.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £6.92k | £10.74k | £16.45k | £28.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 April 2024 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 23 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO BRING SUSTAINABLE IMPROVED DRINKING WATER, SANITATION AND HYGIENE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SUB-SAHARAN WEST AFRICA TO THOSE WHO HAVE ACCESS TO ONLY UNIMPROVED FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO IMPROVED DRINKING WATER, SANITATION AND HYGIENE THROUGH APPROPRIATE TECHNOLOGIES AND EDUCATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES. DEFINITIONS: FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "UNIMPROVED SANITATION" MEANS OPEN DEFECATION: WHEN HUMAN FAECES ARE DISPOSED OF IN FIELDS, FORESTS, BUSHES, OPEN BODIES OF WATER, BEACHES OR OTHER OPEN SPACES OR DISPOSED OF WITH SOLID WASTE. UNIMPROVED SANITATION FACILITIES DO NOT ENSURE HYGIENIC SEPARATION OF HUMAN EXCRETA FROM HUMAN CONTACT. UNIMPROVED FACILITIES INCLUDE PIT LATRINES WITHOUT A SLAB OR PLATFORM, HANGING LATRINES AND BUCKET LATRINES. SHARED SANITATION FACILITIES: SANITATION FACILITIES OF AN OTHERWISE ACCEPTABLE TYPE SHARED BETWEEN TWO OR MORE HOUSEHOLDS. ONLY FACILITIES THAT ARE NOT SHARED OR NOT PUBLIC ARE CONSIDERED IMPROVED. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "IMPROVED SANITATION" MEANS IMPROVED SANITATION FACILITIES: ARE LIKELY TO ENSURE HYGIENIC SEPARATION OF HUMAN EXCRETA FROM HUMAN CONTACT. THEY INCLUDE THE FOLLOWING FACILITIES: FLUSH/POUR FLUSH TO: PIPED SEWER SYSTEM, SEPTIC TANK, PIT LATRINE, VENTILATED IMPROVED PIT (VIP) LATRINE, PIT LATRINE WITH SLAB, COMPOSTING TOILET. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "UNIMPROVED DRINKING WATER" MEANS UNPROTECTED DUG WELL, UNPROTECTED SPRING, CART WITH SMALL TANK/DRUM, SURFACE WATER, BOTTLED WATER (BOTTLED WATER IS CONSIDERED TO BE IMPROVED ONLY WHEN THE HOUSEHOLD USES WATER FROM ANOTHER IMPROVED SOURCE FOR COOKING AND PERSONAL HYGIENE). SURFACE DRINKING-WATER SOURCES: RIVER, DAM, LAKE, POND, STREAM, CANAL, IRRIGATION CHANNELS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "IMPROVED DRINKING WATER" MEANS PUBLIC TAPS OR STANDPIPES, TUBE WELLS OR BOREHOLES, PROTECTED DUG WELLS, PROTECTED SPRINGS, RAINWATER COLLECTION. PIPED HOUSEHOLD WATER CONNECTION LOCATED INSIDE THE USER?S DWELLING, PLOT OR YARD. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE "APPROPRIATE TECHNOLOGY (AT)" MEANS AT IS TECHNOLOGY THAT IS DESIGNED TO BE "APPROPRIATE" TO THE CONTEXT OF ITS USE. TYPICAL ATS MAY BE MORE LABOUR INTENSIVE BUT REQUIRE FEWER RESOURCES, AND USE LOW COST AND READILY AVAILABLE MATERIALS WHEREVER POSSIBLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 LANGLEY ROAD
CHIPPENHAM
SN15 1BX
- Phone:
- 07795832540
- Email:
- hello@fountainoflife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window