Accounts and annual returns GIVING FOR LATVIA

Charity Number: 1161932
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 03 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 02 March 2024 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 02 March 2024 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window