GIVING FOR LATVIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Purpose: to provide aid to children and parents in Latvia, who have suffered from emotional and physical abuse, and to those disadvantaged by age, disability, financial problems or other hardships. Activities: - raising funds - collecting donations in kind - other skilled volunteer support (for example distance translation of documents from Latvian to English)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
- Latvia
Governance
- 01 June 2015: Standard registration
- GFL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIELA UTANE | Chair | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Aija Bruno | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTINS NIKOLAJEVS | Trustee | 10 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.58k | £21.43k | £34.41k | £34.41k | £23.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.44k | £21.62k | £33.53k | £25.93k | £28.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 March 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 March 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS IN LATVIA WHO HAVE SUFFERED FROM EMOTIONAL AND/OR PHYSICAL ABUSE, AND TO THOSE DISADVANTAGED BY AGE, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL PROBLEMS OR OTHER HARDSHIPS
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 VIVIENNE CLOSE
TWICKENHAM
TW1 2JX
- Phone:
- 07799348095
- Email:
- info@givingforlatvia.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window