Financial history SHREE HANUMAN TEMPLE

Charity number: 1168521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.24k £421.04k £238.31k £199.22k £220.11k
Total expenditure £4.07k £12.82k £74.05k £198.83k £172.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A