Financial history Bethel Prayer House Camberley

Charity number: 1161705
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.43k £127.79k £51.13k £38.51k £87.17k
Total expenditure £31.03k £17.16k £41.47k £26.45k £38.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A