BE KIND MOVEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to promote the physical, mental and moral development of children and young people in the UK or overseas, including the development of emotional intelligence skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 May 2015: CIO registration
- BKM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Ardley-Price | Chair | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarisha Naidoo | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Kelsey | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PREMILA PURI | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR SHAVY MAKH BSC MPHIL | Trustee | 30 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £6.45k | £53.60k | £54.15k | £47.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61k | £7.69k | £45.35k | £49.14k | £49.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 July 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 28 MAY 2015 AMENDED ON 10 SEP 2018 as amended on 22 May 2020 as amended on 31 Jan 2021 as amended on 09 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
To promote physical, mental and moral development of children and young people in the UK or overseas, including development of emotional intelligence skills.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Mews
Little Brunswick Street
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 5JL
- Phone:
- 07951242929
- Email:
- admin@bekindmovement.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window