SANCTUARY FAMILY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sanctuary Family Support provides:- 1-1 support, advice, counselling, advocacy, home visits, referrals, peer to peer group, relapse prevention, health & wellbeing workshops, holistic therapies, drug education and information, sign posting, family cohesion activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 05 May 2015: CIO registration
- 11 August 2015: Funds received from 1077908 SANCTUARY FAMILY SUPPORT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MADELEINE VAZ DIPC | Chair | 24 March 1999 |
|
|
||||
Roy Davis CIPD | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Dempsey | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JUNE HUDSON | Trustee | 22 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
DRUSILLA CLARKE LLB, DIP C | Trustee | 22 February 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.03k | £91.91k | £86.67k | £103.01k | £162.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.74k | £82.91k | £83.55k | £94.48k | £101.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.75k | £5.93k | £7.20k | £1.53k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 May 2015 as amended on 29 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONGST PERSON SUFFERING FROM SUBSTANCE MISUSE BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT,ADVICE AND COUNSELLING FOR THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO SUBSTANCE MISUSE
Contact information
- Address:
-
322-326 Upper Parliament Street
LIVERPOOL
L8 7QL
- Phone:
- 01517350747
- Email:
- ruth@sanctuaryfs.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window