CARPET MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MUSEUM OF CARPET EXISTS TO PROMOTE THE HERITAGE AND HISTORY OF THE 300-YEAR OLD CARPET MAKING INDUSTRY IN KIDDERMINSTER THAT BECAME THE CENTRE OF THE TRADE IN CARPETS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 September 2015: CIO registration
- 28 November 2016: Funds received from 512409 THE CARPET MUSEUM TRUST
- MUSEUM OF CARPET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Winifred Preece | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Gilbert | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Howard Briggs | Trustee | 12 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Roger Wheadon | Trustee | 14 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Thomas Hopkins | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Verry Adam JP | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|||||
GORDON COOPER | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|||||
DIANA HEATHER FREEMAN | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Perrin | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN PUGH-COOK | Trustee | 03 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.02k | £120.81k | £101.25k | £85.36k | £90.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.83k | £109.13k | £100.28k | £88.70k | £106.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.79k | £36.21k | £14.16k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 03 SEP 2015 AMENDED ON 29 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM AND/OR ART GALLERY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Museum of Carpet
Stour Vale Mill
Green Street
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 1AZ
- Phone:
- 0156269028
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window