RURAL COMMUNITY DEFIBRILLATOR GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and supply of Public Access Defibrillators within the rural areas of Buckinghamshire. Activities include fund raising; Awareness and Confidence training as well as installing and maintaining equipment. All activities have the prime aim of saving lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 14 July 2015: Standard registration
- RCDG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK TUBB | Chair | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bridget Day | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|||||
PAUL ROGERSON | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Philip Graham | Trustee | 10 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.21k | £200 | £20 | £60 | £65 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.85k | £0 | £446 | £192 | £2.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN THE RURAL AREAS OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE BY PROVIDING, INSTALLING, MAINTAINING AND PROMOTING AWARENESS OF PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATORS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canastel
Water Lane
Speen
Princes Risborough
HP27 0SW
- Phone:
- 01494488315
- Email:
- paulrogerson1@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window