SYMPHONY CONSORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 November 2015: Standard registration
- SYMPHONY CONSORT (Working name)
- GBM (Previous name)
- GOD'S BRIDE MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stefan Brown | Trustee | 11 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Demi Ariyo | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Thompson | Trustee | 13 January 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.66k | £99.05k | £75.26k | £44.88k | £39.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.09k | £105.39k | £82.88k | £44.11k | £42.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 216 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 January 2024 | 231 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 August 2023 | 434 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 August 2023 | 434 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED ON 29 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Lea Hill Road
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2AS
- Phone:
- 07478685158
- Email:
- info@choseninc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window